Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Authority to Adopt Regulations - Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Clarifying that the Maryland Insurance Commissioner has the authority to adopt regulations to carry out certain provisions of law governing pharmacy benefits managers; and repealing a certain provision of law rendered obsolete by a certain provision of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Authority to Adopt Regulations - Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1602, 15-1619 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM