Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Benson, Currie, Kelley, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person who is the subject of a certain warrant to file a certain petition for expungement; providing that a person who, on or after October 1, 2018, has been charged with the commission of a certain crime, has been charged with a certain civil offense or infraction, or is the subject of a certain warrant is entitled to automatic expungement of certain records under certain circumstances; specifying that certain dispositions are eligible for automatic expungement at certain times; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1383
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-105, 10-105.1, 10-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM