Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspensions and Expulsions
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the county superintendent of schools or the county superintendent's designated representative, when making a decision to extend a student's suspension, to complete a certain investigation by the 10th day of a student's initial suspension; requiring a certain student to return to school after a suspension if a certain investigation has not been completed within a certain period of time except under certain circumstances; requiring a county board to provide access to a certain student to the student's assignments; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspensions and Expulsions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspensions and Expulsions
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-305, 7-305.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM