Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Notice of Rent Increase
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an owner of a mobile home park to provide written notice of a rent increase to each resident affected by the increase at least 90 days before the effective date of the increase; requiring the notice to identify all affected residents by lot number, name, or group or the park owner to make the names and addresses of the affected residents available on request to a certain resident; and providing for the application of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Notice of Rent Increase
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Notice of Rent Increase
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
(   8A-101, 8A-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page