Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Construction - Incentive Program and Pilot Program - Established
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations that establish per-pupil State school construction funding amounts under certain conditions; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to conduct by January 1, 2019, an initial statewide facilities assessment; establishing the Public School Facility Construction Incentive Program; establishing the Public School Facility Construction Pilot Program to encourage innovative public school facility construction projects; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public School Construction - Incentive Program and Pilot Program - Established
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-302.1, 5-314, 5-315 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM