Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Medical Care - Administration of Opioid Antidotes - Immunity
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying certain immunity from civil liability for certain acts or omissions to certain persons who administer to individuals who appear to be experiencing an opioid overdose a certain dose or certain doses of a certain opioid antidote.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0924
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Emergency Medical Care - Administration of Opioid Antidotes - Immunity
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Emergency Medical Care - Administration of Opioid Antidotes - Immunity
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM