Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances Registration – Authorized Providers – Continuing Education
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an authorized provider to attest on the registration form to the Maryland Department of Health that the authorized provider completed 2 hours of continuing education before the authorized provider may be registered by the Department or renew a certain registration to dispense a controlled dangerous substance; requiring certain continuing education to be related to the prescribing or dispensing of controlled dangerous substances and be recognized by certain licensing or accrediting entities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1452
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {437570/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Controlled Dangerous Substances Registration - Authorized Providers - Continuing Medical Education
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {437570/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Text - Third - Controlled Dangerous Substances Registration – Authorized Providers – Continuing Education
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text - Chapter - Controlled Dangerous Substances Registration – Authorized Providers – Continuing Education
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM