Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Schools - Armed School Resource Officers
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, Bates, Brochin, Cassilly, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Klausmeier, Mathias, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring each public school to have an armed school resource officer present on school grounds during regular school hours on school days; requiring the Department of State Police to assign a State Police officer to a certain public school under certain circumstances; requiring a certain State Police officer to be present on school grounds during regular school hours on school days and to carry a firearm; and authorizing a private school to have an armed school resource officer present on school grounds.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1801
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Schools - Armed School Resource Officers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Schools - Armed School Resource Officers
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-441 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM