Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Manno, Peters, Zucker, and Muse
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Temporary Disability Assistance Program in the Department of Human Services; requiring the Family Investment Administration to be the central coordinating and directing agency of the Program; requiring the Program to be administered by the local departments of social services in a certain manner; specifying the requirements for entitlement to assistance under the Program; requiring the monthly allowable assistance under the Program to equal at least $215 in fiscal year 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1615
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {797575/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {783124/1 (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {797575/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Floor Amendment {783124/1 (Senator Muse) Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 60
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 59
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-201, 5-205, 5-5B-01 through 5-5B-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM