Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police Force
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an independent institution of higher education in Baltimore City to establish a campus police force based on a certain memorandum of understanding; authorizing a police officer of a campus police force of an independent institution of higher education in Baltimore City to exercise the powers granted to a peace and police officer only on certain property with certain exceptions; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1803
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police Force
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-211.1 )
(   3-101, 3-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM