Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that the owner of a burial site or land encompassing a burial site that is more than 50 years old and in which the majority of persons interred have been interred for more than 50 years to consult with the Maryland Historical Trust regarding certain matters; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant a property tax credit on a real property improvement that substantiates, demarcates, commemorates, or celebrates a burial ground; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0877
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {677579/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Burial Sites - Access, Disinterment, Criminal Penalties, and Tax Credit
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Reassigned to Finance Budget and Taxation 44
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {677579/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Text - Chapter - Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-121, 14-121.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM