Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
21st Century School Facilities Act
Sponsored by
Senators DeGrange, King, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirements for awarding contracts to bidders for school buildings; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to conduct a certain facility assessment; specifying the process for the review and approval of public school construction projects; establishing the Local Share of School Construction Costs Revolving Loan Fund; declaring the intent of the General Assembly regarding funding for public school construction; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1783
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - 21st Century School Facilities Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - 21st Century School Facilities Act
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-303, 4-114, 4-126, 4-134, 5-112, 5-301, 5-301.3, 5-302, 5-309, 5-310, 5-314, 5-315 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM