Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - St. Thomas Methodist Church Restoration
Sponsored by
Senator Miller
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $25,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Trustees of Christ United Methodist Church for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of St. Thomas Methodist Church, located in Prince George's County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; prohibiting the use of the loan proceeds for sectarian religious purposes; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1823
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2019 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 186). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 186 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - St. Thomas Methodist Church Restoration
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Hearing 3/10 at 9:00 a.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page