Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that 1.5% of the proceeds of video lottery terminals at certain video lottery facilities be paid to the Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1233
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Funding
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM