Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Transportation Authority Police
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for law enforcement officers to include law enforcement officers who are members of the Maryland Transportation Authority Police and reside in a political subdivision in which the crime rate exceeds the State's crime rate; and applying the Act to all taxable years after December 31, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1419
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Manno) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Manno) Adopted 43
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Senate Rules 43
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Transportation Authority Police
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:37 PM