Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance Program
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to establish a State Reinsurance Program to provide reinsurance to carriers that offer individual health benefit plans in the State, and that is consistent with certain laws; requiring that the Program be designed to mitigate the impact of high-risk individuals on certain rates; providing that, beginning January 1, 2019, funding for reinsurance in the individual health insurance market through the Program may be made using certain funds; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {377071/1
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {377071/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-6)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Middleton) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Referred Finance 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance Program
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {377071/1 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hough) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {377071/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance Program
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-4) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (130-6) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance Program
(   31-107, 31-117, 31-117.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:37 PM
Click to return on the top page