Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Lifetime Sexual Offender Supervision - Violations and Petitions for Discharge
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a sexual offender management team to report a violation of a condition of lifetime sexual offender supervision to the office of a certain State's Attorney; requiring a certain judge to conduct a certain hearing; authorizing a certain judge to act in a certain matter under certain circumstances; requiring a certain sentencing court to adjudicate rather than hear and adjudicate a certain petition; altering the time period before a certain petition may be renewed after being denied; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Smith) Rejected (30-15)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
48C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Smith) Rejected (30-15) 47
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Smith) Adopted 48C
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Senate Rules 48C
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Lifetime Sexual Offender Supervision - Violations and Petitions for Discharge
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:37 PM