Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
International Education - Support
Sponsored by
Senators Jones-Rodwell, Benson, Conway, Garagiola, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Peters, and Pugh
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Urging the Maryland Higher Education Commission, the Maryland Independent College and University Association, the Maryland Association of Community Colleges, the University System of Maryland, Morgan State University, and St. Mary's College of Maryland to support and encourage students and faculty to promote international education as a part of curricular and extracurricular life at colleges and universities in the State.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {774637/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
35
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {774637/1 Report Adopted 30
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 35
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM