Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Susquehanna River Basin - Sediment and Nutrient Pollution (National Chesapeake Bay Preservation Act of 2015)
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Bates, Brochin, Cassilly, Currie, Eckardt, Edwards, Getty, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, King, Middleton, Montgomery, Norman, Pugh, Raskin, Reilly, Salling, Waugh, and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Urging the United States Congress to authorize a review of the studies related to the Susquehanna River Basin for the purpose of initiating and funding a project by the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers to address the transport of sediment and nutrients from the Susquehanna River Basin in order to minimize the pollutant load reaching the Chesapeake Bay from the Susquehanna River; and providing that a copy of the resolution be forwarded by the Department of Legislative Services to specified individuals.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {754234/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Rereferred to House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2015 1/23/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments {754234/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 44
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Rereferred to House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM