Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Patuxent River Watershed - Amendment of Patuxent River Policy Plan
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Planning)
Status
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Approving the 2015 Patuxent River Policy Plan update as an amendment to the Patuxent River Policy Plan; providing, on approval, that the amended Plan will serve as a policy guide for the Patuxent River Commission, State agencies, and local governments in enhancing restoration and protection of the Patuxent River watershed; and resolving that a copy of the resolution be forwarded by the Department of Legislative Services to specified individuals.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2015
Legislative Date
10/05/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/22/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
12
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/22/2015 10/05/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/22/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 1/22/2016 1/25/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 10
Senate 1/26/2016 1/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 10
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 12
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 13
House 3/31/2016 3/31/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 3:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM