Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Sponsored by
Senators McCray, Augustine, Beidle, Eckardt, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Guzzone, Hayes, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Peters, Pinsky, Reilly, Rosapepe, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Supporting the fundamental requirements for United 2026 as laid out in FIFA's "Proposal for a United Human Rights Strategy"; and encouraging all host stadiums, cities, ports of entry, and fan zones to provide certain atmospheres, experiences, and policies for fans, spectators, players, officials, and volunteers at the 2026 FIFA World Cup.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0007
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - 2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {248972/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {853021/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/24 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {433729/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - 2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
36
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - 2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments {248972/1 Adopted 33
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Floor Amendment {853021/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31) 33
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/24 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 33
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Floor Amendment {433729/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 34
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - 2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 36
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 11:22 AM