Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Sponsored by
Senators McCray, Augustine, Beidle, Eckardt, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Guzzone, Hayes, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Peters, Pinsky, Reilly, Rosapepe, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Joint Resolution 1
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Supporting the fundamental requirements for United 2026 as laid out in FIFA's "Proposal for a United Human Rights Strategy"; and encouraging all host stadiums, cities, ports of entry, and fan zones to provide certain atmospheres, experiences, and policies for fans, spectators, players, officials, and volunteers at the 2026 FIFA World Cup.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0007
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - 2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {248972/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {853021/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/24 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {433729/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - 2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (109-18)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-21)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Joint Resolution 1
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - 2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - 2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Favorable with Amendments {248972/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Floor Amendment {853021/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-31) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/24 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Floor Amendment {433729/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - 2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (109-18) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (110-21) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Joint Resolution 1
Text - Chapter - 2026 FIFA World Cup - Protection of Human Rights
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page