Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Benson, Conway, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Ramirez, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Applying to the U.S. Congress for an amendments convention called under Article V of the U.S. Constitution, on the application of the legislatures of two-thirds of the several states, to propose an amendment to the U.S. Constitution that affirms every citizen's individual right to vote, reserves inalienable political rights to natural persons, and authorizes regulation of campaign contributions and electioneering expenditures.
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0002
Introduced in a prior session as: SJ0006 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464132/1
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464132/1
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464132/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (33-14)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {973420/1 Rejected (18-29)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {273720/1 Rejected (18-29)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {333227/2 Rejected (18-29)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-18)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163329/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (89-49)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Senators Pinsky, Rosapepe, and Salling
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {464132/1 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {464132/1 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Hough) Adopted 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments {464132/1 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (33-14) 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {973420/1 Rejected (18-29) 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {273720/1 Rejected (18-29) 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {333227/2 Rejected (18-29) 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed (29-18) 59
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 63
House 4/09/2015 4/09/2015 Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments {163329/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (89-49) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Senate Requests House Recede 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Senators Pinsky, Rosapepe, and Salling 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM