Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Conway, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, and Zucker
Status
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing and withdrawing specified applications to Congress to call a Constitutional Convention; and urging the legislatures of specified other states to repeal and withdraw such applications.
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0002
Introduced in a prior session as: SJ0005 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Constitutional Convention - Amendment - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174339/2
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174339/2 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {793128/1 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {263324/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-32)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {113123/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {543924/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883223/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {513621/1 (Delegate Metzgar) Rejected (49-89)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-47)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Constitutional Convention - Amendment - Repeal
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {174339/2 33
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 33
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {174339/2 Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Floor Amendment {793128/1 (Senator Conway) Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 34
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Floor Amendment {263324/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-32) 35
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Floor Amendment {113123/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 35
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Floor Amendment {543924/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 35
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 37
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 40
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {883223/1 Adopted 61
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Floor Amendment {513621/1 (Delegate Metzgar) Rejected (49-89) 61
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (93-47) 62
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Text - Chapter - Constitutional Convention - Amendments - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM