Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War II
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Bates, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Ready, Conway, Pinsky, Kagan, Rosapepe, Salling, Simonaire, Waugh, and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the profound hope of the General Assembly of Maryland that the historical record of the crimes against the "ianfu" or "comfort women" of World War II will serve as a lasting reminder to the world that crimes against humanity will not be condoned or tolerated; and providing that a copy of this resolution be forwarded by the Department of Legislative Services to specified individuals.
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0008
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {394939/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments {394939/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 44
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM