Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Montgomery, Jennings, Young, Conway, Dyson, Pinsky, Jacobs, Colburn, Glassman, Hershey, Kittleman, and Mathias
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Urging the United States Congress to authorize and fund a specified project to dredge behind the Conowingo Dam in order to preserve the dam's capability to block pollutants in the Susquehanna River from reaching the Chesapeake Bay; and providing that a copy of the resolution be forwarded by the Department of Legislative Services to specified individuals.
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0006
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {334537/1
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jacobs) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {334537/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) {233922/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {363023/1
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {363023/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {813423/2 Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {334537/1 31
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Laid Over (Senator Jacobs) Adopted 31
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {334537/1 Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) {233922/1 Adopted 32
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {363023/1 32
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 32
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {363023/1 Withdrawn 33
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {813423/2 Adopted 33
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 38
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM