Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Senators Kasemeyer, Madaleno, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Directing the Attorney General to take specified actions regarding civil and criminal suits and actions that are based on the federal government's action or inaction that threatens the public interest and welfare of the residents of the State; requiring the Attorney General, except under specified circumstances, to provide the Governor with specified notice and an opportunity to review and comment on specified suits and actions before commencing specified suits and actions; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0003
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-28)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-17)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Delegate Healey) Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate McMillan) Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-50)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Miller) Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-28) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Second Reading Passed 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Senate 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (29-17) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Delegate Healey) Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate McMillan) Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (89-50) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Returned Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Text - Chapter - Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page