Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Conway, Frosh, Gladden, Kelley, Madaleno, Montgomery, Peters, Pinsky, Robey, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying to the U.S. Congress for an amendments convention called under Article V of the U.S. Constitution, on the application of the legislatures of two-thirds of the several states, to propose an amendment to the U.S. Constitution that affirms every citizen's freedom to vote and restores free and fair elections in America.
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0007
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654137/1
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Getty) Adopted (26-21)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654137/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable with Amendments {654137/1 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Getty) Adopted (26-21) 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments {654137/1 Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM