Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business and Economic Development - NASA Wallops Flight Facility - Commercial Rocket Boosters and Spacecraft
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Eckardt, Hershey, Jennings, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Norman, Rosapepe, Waugh, and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Urging the National Aeronautics and Space Administration to conduct an environmental impact study related to landing commercial booster rockets and spacecraft at its Wallops Flight Facility; recognizing the enormous economic potential value in the State of the Wallops Flight Facility; and providing that a copy of the resolution be forwarded by the Department of Legislative Services to specified individuals.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0007
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed 45
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 48
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM