Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dedication - Henrietta Lacks Way
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Urging the governing body of Baltimore County to dedicate a specified portion of Dundalk Avenue in Baltimore County as Henrietta Lacks Way.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Dedication - Henrietta Lacks Way
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Dedication - Henrietta Lacks Way
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page