Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Bates, Conway, Currie, Edwards, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, Ready, Serafini, Pinsky, Kagan, Robinson, Salling, Simonaire, Young, Waugh, and Zucker
Status
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Commemorating the bicentennial of the birth of Frederick Douglass; and providing that a copy of this resolution be forwarded by the Department of Legislative Services to certain individuals.
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0008
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {334234/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {334234/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Text - Chapter - Commemorating the Bicentennial of the Birth of Frederick Douglass
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:37 PM
Click to return on the top page