Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Formally requesting the Maryland Human Trafficking Task Force to perform a specified study and provide a recommendation by a specified date; and providing for the distribution of copies of the Resolution.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/04/2014 Text - First - Human Trafficking
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM