Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Astle, Benson, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expressing the sharp disagreement of the General Assembly of Maryland with the repeal of the Affordable Care Act; urging the U.S. Congress to promptly protect provisions of the federal Affordable Care Act that ensure all Marylanders have access to affordable health insurance coverage, free from discriminatory rates and policies; urging the Governor of Maryland to join in urging the U.S. congress to promptly protect specified provisions of the federal Affordable Care Act; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page