Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 (SB0205)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sales - Required Multiple Purchases
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0285)
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0506 (SB0472)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Districts - Legislative Districting Plan References
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0994
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Delivery - Class A License Holders
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0996 (SB0763)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 (SB0821)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1336 (SB0761)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission – Executive Director – Clarification
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205 (HB0012)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 (HB0422)
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 (HB0506)
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Districts – Legislative Districting Plan References
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761 (HB1336)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Executive Director - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 (HB0996)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 (HB1232)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 (SB0205) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
HB0185 Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sales - Required Multiple Purchases Delegate Branch, T. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
HB0422 (SB0285) Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
HB0506 (SB0472) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Districts - Legislative Districting Plan References Delegate Branch, T. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0994 Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Delivery - Class A License Holders Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
HB0996 (SB0763) Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021) Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
HB1232 (SB0821) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 11:00 a.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
HB1336 (SB0761) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission – Executive Director – Clarification Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0205 (HB0012) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0285 (HB0422) Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0472 (HB0506) Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Districts – Legislative Districting Plan References Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2021 - 1:15 PM
SB0761 (HB1336) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Executive Director - Clarification Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2021 - 9:00 AM
SB0763 (HB0996) Alcoholic Beverages – Class A Licenses – Retail Grocery Establishments (Healthy Food Accountability Act of 2021) Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0821 (HB1232) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 7:27 PM
Click to return on the top page