Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0004 /CH0378
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Vaportinis and Similar Devices - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 /CH0518 (SB0546/CH0517)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0261 (SB0161/CH0278)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Hard Cider - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Minnick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0337 /CH0394
Title
Farm Breweries - Location and Self-Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0596
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Breweries - Festival Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0359 /CH0272 (SB0075/CH0271)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maximum Alcohol Content
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372
Title
Video Lottery Operation Licenses - Expansion to Alcoholic Beverages Licensed Establishments
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0464 /CH0407
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses - Retail Sale - Prepackaged Beer
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 /CH0414
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' Market Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0774 (SB0445)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production Limit
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0830 (SB0287)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at Retail
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Unlawful Drinking or Possessing an Open Container - Failure to Appear in Court
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1101 (SB0859)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Advertising Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0075 /CH0271 (HB0359/CH0272)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maximum Alcohol Content
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 /CH0278 (HB0261)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Hard Cider - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209
Title
Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226 /CH0280
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0287 (HB0830)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at Retail
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445 (HB0774)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production Limit
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0517 (HB0208/CH0518)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0859 (HB1101)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Advertising Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A, Class C, and Class D Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0004 /CH0378 Alcoholic Beverages - Vaportinis and Similar Devices - Prohibited Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0208 /CH0518 (SB0546/CH0517) Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0261 (SB0161/CH0278) Alcoholic Beverages - Hard Cider - Definition Delegate Minnick 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0337 /CH0394 Farm Breweries - Location and Self-Distribution Delegate Schulz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0356 /CH0596 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Breweries - Festival Licenses Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0359 /CH0272 (SB0075/CH0271) Alcoholic Beverages - Maximum Alcohol Content Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 272
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0372 Video Lottery Operation Licenses - Expansion to Alcoholic Beverages Licensed Establishments Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0464 /CH0407 Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses - Retail Sale - Prepackaged Beer Delegate Schulz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 /CH0414 Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' Market Permit - Establishment Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0774 (SB0445) Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production Limit Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0830 (SB0287) Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at Retail Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0964 Alcoholic Beverages - Unlawful Drinking or Possessing an Open Container - Failure to Appear in Court Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1101 (SB0859) Alcoholic Beverages - Advertising Regulations Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0075 /CH0271 (HB0359/CH0272) Alcoholic Beverages - Maximum Alcohol Content Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0161 /CH0278 (HB0261) Alcoholic Beverages - Hard Cider - Definition Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0209 Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0226 /CH0280 Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0287 (HB0830) Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at Retail Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0445 (HB0774) Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production Limit Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0546 /CH0517 (HB0208/CH0518) Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0859 (HB1101) Alcoholic Beverages - Advertising Regulations Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0888 Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A, Class C, and Class D Licenses Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM