Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abandoned Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0521 (SB0366/CH0462)
Title
Baltimore City - Extinguishment or Redemption of Ground Rents
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1303 /CH0553 (SB0809/CH0552)
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308 /CH0515 (SB0642/CH0514)
Title
Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of Payment
Sponsor
Delegate Minnick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028
Title
Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 /CH0462 (HB0521)
Title
Baltimore City - Extinguishment or Redemption of Ground Rents
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 /CH0514 (HB1308/CH0515)
Title
Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0645
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Principal Residency - Information from Motor Vehicle Administration and Counties
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809 /CH0552 (HB1303/CH0553)
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0521 (SB0366/CH0462) Baltimore City - Extinguishment or Redemption of Ground Rents Delegate Anderson 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1303 /CH0553 (SB0809/CH0552) Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1308 /CH0515 (SB0642/CH0514) Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1339 Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of Payment Delegate Minnick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0028 Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0366 /CH0462 (HB0521) Baltimore City - Extinguishment or Redemption of Ground Rents Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0642 /CH0514 (HB1308/CH0515) Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial Evictions Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0645 Homestead Property Tax Credit - Principal Residency - Information from Motor Vehicle Administration and Counties Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0809 /CH0552 (HB1303/CH0553) Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM