Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abandoned Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182
Title
Prince George's County - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property - Foreclosure PG 404-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210
Title
Prince George's County - Abandoned Property - Special Property Tax Rate PG 400-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1079
Title
Frederick County and Prince George’s County – Building and Housing Codes – Materials Used to Board or Secure Residential Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 (SB0951/CH0568)
Title
Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 (SB0954)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 /CH0708
Title
Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 /CH0568 (HB1112)
Title
Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954 (HB1246)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0182 Prince George's County - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property - Foreclosure PG 404-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0210 Prince George's County - Abandoned Property - Special Property Tax Rate PG 400-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1079 Frederick County and Prince George’s County – Building and Housing Codes – Materials Used to Board or Secure Residential Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1112 (SB0951/CH0568) Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1246 (SB0954) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0444 /CH0708 Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 708
Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0951 /CH0568 (HB1112) Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0954 (HB1246) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM