Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abandoned Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 (SB0509/CH0276)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218
Title
Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 /CH0732 (SB0754)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1287 (SB0632)
Title
Housing - Community Development Program Act - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 (SB0255)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403 (SB0741/CH0334)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Properties Subject to Historic Preservation Easements - Waiver Process
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 (HB1302)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557)
Title
Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 /CH0334 (HB1403)
Title
Secretary of Planning – Adaptive Reuse of Historic Properties – Study
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB1266/CH0732)
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0557 (SB0509/CH0276) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1218 Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1266 /CH0732 (SB0754) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established Delegate Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1287 (SB0632) Housing - Community Development Program Act - Funding Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 (SB0255) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Economic Matters
HB1403 (SB0741/CH0334) Maryland Historical Trust - Properties Subject to Historic Preservation Easements - Waiver Process Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0255 (HB1302) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557) Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0741 /CH0334 (HB1403) Secretary of Planning – Adaptive Reuse of Historic Properties – Study Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 (HB1266/CH0732) National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM