Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Abandoned Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0021 /CH0028 (SB0088/CH0029)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143 /CH0075 (SB0219/CH0076)
Title
State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0227 (SB0176)
Title
Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 (SB0387)
Title
Housing - Community Development Program Act - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0504
Title
Maryland Boat Act - Abandoned and Sunken Vessels
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0626
Title
Baltimore County - Repossession - Disposition of Property
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696
Title
State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Vessels Remaining on Private Property
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882
Title
Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 (SB0675)
Title
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276
Title
County Property Tax - Classifications of Real Property and Authority to Set Special Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1490
Title
Environment - Building Energy Performance Standards and Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Targets (Clean Buildings Jobs Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0029 (HB0021/CH0028)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 /CH0049 (HB0093/CH0048)
Title
Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176 (HB0227)
Title
Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 /CH0076 (HB0143/CH0075)
Title
State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257
Title
Fishing Gear - Lost and Abandoned Crab Pots - Study
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 (HB0472)
Title
Housing - Community Development Program Act - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB0990)
Title
Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1059
Title
Criminal Procedure - Restitution - Trauma-Informed Restorative Justice
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0021 /CH0028 (SB0088/CH0029) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Delegate Cardin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0093 /CH0048 (SB0155/CH0049) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Delegate Jackson, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 48
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0143 /CH0075 (SB0219/CH0076) State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal Delegate Kipke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 75
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0227 (SB0176) Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 (SB0387) Housing - Community Development Program Act - Funding Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0504 Maryland Boat Act - Abandoned and Sunken Vessels Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0626 Baltimore County - Repossession - Disposition of Property Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0696 State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Vessels Remaining on Private Property Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0882 Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 (SB0675) Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1276 County Property Tax - Classifications of Real Property and Authority to Set Special Rates Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1490 Environment - Building Energy Performance Standards and Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Targets (Clean Buildings Jobs Act of 2020) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0088 /CH0029 (HB0021/CH0028) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2020 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
SB0155 /CH0049 (HB0093/CH0048) Consumer Protection - Mobile Home Purchasers Senator Augustine 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0176 (HB0227) Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0219 /CH0076 (HB0143/CH0075) State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 76
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0257 Fishing Gear - Lost and Abandoned Crab Pots - Study Senator Bailey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 (HB0472) Housing - Community Development Program Act - Funding Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 (HB0990) Baltimore County - Foreclosure Proceedings - Affidavit That Property Is Vacant or Unfit for Human Habitation Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1059 Criminal Procedure - Restitution - Trauma-Informed Restorative Justice Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:37 PM