Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abduction

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477
Title
Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478 (SB0861)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943
Title
Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping and Prostitution - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311
Title
Crimes - Trafficking of Human Organs - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0478)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0477 Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB0478 (SB0861) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0943 Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping and Prostitution - Penalty Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1311 Crimes - Trafficking of Human Organs - Penalties Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0861 (HB0478) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM