Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abduction

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0076 /CH0610
Title
Department of State Police - Investigation Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077 /CH0611
Title
Family Law - Missing Children - Reporting Requirements and Repeal of Advisory Council
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252
Title
Protection of Persons and Property - Criminal Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266 (SB0498)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 (SB0243)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374 (SB0603/CH0567)
Title
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757
Title
Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836
Title
Educational Institutions - Notice of Criminal Activity and Threats to Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847
Title
Criminal Procedure - Crime of Violence - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1601
Title
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122
Title
Criminal Procedure - Reconsiderations of Sentences - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 (HB0304)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0315
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide, Kidnapping, and Drug Offenses - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 (HB0266)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0603 /CH0567 (HB0374)
Title
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0076 /CH0610 Department of State Police - Investigation Authority Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 610
Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0077 /CH0611 Family Law - Missing Children - Reporting Requirements and Repeal of Advisory Council Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Judiciary
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0252 Protection of Persons and Property - Criminal Immunity Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0266 (SB0498) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0304 (SB0243) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0374 (SB0603/CH0567) Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes Delegate Anderson 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0757 Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0836 Educational Institutions - Notice of Criminal Activity and Threats to Safety Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0847 Criminal Procedure - Crime of Violence - Definition Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1601 Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement Officer Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0122 Criminal Procedure - Reconsiderations of Sentences - Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0243 (HB0304) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0315 Criminal Law - Homicide, Kidnapping, and Drug Offenses - Penalties Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0498 (HB0266) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0603 /CH0567 (HB0374) Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1023 Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM