Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Abduction

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0933
Title
Juvenile Offenders - Dual Sentencing
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103 (SB0924)
Title
Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164
Title
Criminal Law - Domestic Terrorism
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308 (SB0919)
Title
Criminal Law – Felony First–Degree Murder – Limitation and Review of Conviction
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1592 (SB1044)
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1308)
Title
Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 (HB1103)
Title
Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951
Title
Criminal Law - Felony First-Degree Murder - Limitation and Resentencing Procedure
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1044 (HB1592)
Title
State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0933 Juvenile Offenders - Dual Sentencing Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 (SB0924) Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1164 Criminal Law - Domestic Terrorism Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1308 (SB0919) Criminal Law – Felony First–Degree Murder – Limitation and Review of Conviction Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1338 Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1592 (SB1044) State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0919 (HB1308) Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0924 (HB1103) Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0951 Criminal Law - Felony First-Degree Murder - Limitation and Resentencing Procedure Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB1044 (HB1592) State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide Prevention Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/17/2020 8:37 PM