Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abortion -see also- Reproductive Matters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335
Title
Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1355 (SB1067)
Title
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1424
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449
Title
Public Health - Abortions - Viability
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 /CH0828 (HB0787/CH0827)
Title
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1067 (HB1355)
Title
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1335 Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1355 (SB1067) Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018 Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1424 Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0449 Public Health - Abortions - Viability Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0629 /CH0828 (HB0787/CH0827) Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1067 (HB1355) Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018 Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM