Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abuse -see also- Child Abuse & Neg.; Elder Abuse & Neg., etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020 (SB0411)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031 (SB0412)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0153
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside and Unattended in Extreme Weather
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225 (SB0269/CH0335)
Title
Domestic Violence - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0227
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263 /CH0233
Title
Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Conspiracy or Solicitation to Commit Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 (SB0414)
Title
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0337 (SB0366)
Title
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362 (SB0393)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581
Title
Civil Actions - Damages for Crimes Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adults - Standing
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0956
Title
Criminal Law - Leaving Dogs Outside and Unattended - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1198 (SB0882/CH0130)
Title
Baltimore City Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside in Extreme Temperatures
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0269 /CH0335 (HB0225)
Title
Domestic Violence - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 (HB0337)
Title
Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 (HB0362)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0411 (HB0020)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412 (HB0031)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414 (HB0301)
Title
Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0882 /CH0130 (HB1198)
Title
Baltimore City Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0020 (SB0411) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0023 Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0031 (SB0412) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0153 Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside and Unattended in Extreme Weather Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0225 (SB0269/CH0335) Domestic Violence - Additional Relief Delegate Dumais 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0227 Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0255 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0263 /CH0233 Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Conspiracy or Solicitation to Commit Murder Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0301 (SB0414) Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0337 (SB0366) Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 (SB0393) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0581 Civil Actions - Damages for Crimes Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adults - Standing Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0956 Criminal Law - Leaving Dogs Outside and Unattended - Prohibition Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HB1198 (SB0882/CH0130) Baltimore City Civilian Review Board Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0018 State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0026 Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside in Extreme Temperatures Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0269 /CH0335 (HB0225) Domestic Violence - Additional Relief Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0366 (HB0337) Correctional Services - Sentencing Review and Parole Eligibility - Juvenile Offenders Sentenced as Adults Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0393 (HB0362) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0411 (HB0020) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0412 (HB0031) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 (HB0301) Public Safety - Segregated Confinement - Report Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0882 /CH0130 (HB1198) Baltimore City Civilian Review Board Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM