Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abuse -see also- Child Abuse & Neg.; Elder Abuse & Neg., etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256
Title
Adult Protective Services - Investigation - Time Period Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 (SB0428)
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 /CH0188 (SB0790/CH0187)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Barber and Cosmetology Professionals - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Education
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0625 (SB0080)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse - Penalties and Restitution
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 (SB0900)
Title
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941 /CH0410 (SB0631)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272
Title
Prince George's County - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse PG 314-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1361
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Hunting Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463 /CH0417
Title
Veterinary Practitioners - Animal Cruelty and Animal Fighting - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 (HB0625)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse - Penalties and Restitution
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084
Title
Maryland Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 (HB0316)
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444
Title
Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631 (HB0941/CH0410)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680 /CH0605
Title
Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0790 /CH0187 (HB0455/CH0188)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Applicability
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900 (HB0803)
Title
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing and License Renewal - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Course
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0256 Adult Protective Services - Investigation - Time Period Increase Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0316 (SB0428) State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - Requirements Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0455 /CH0188 (SB0790/CH0187) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Applicability Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0501 Business Occupations and Professions - Barber and Cosmetology Professionals - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Education Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0625 (SB0080) Criminal Law - Animal Abuse - Penalties and Restitution Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0803 (SB0900) Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0941 /CH0410 (SB0631) Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1272 Prince George's County - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse PG 314-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1361 Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Hunting Exemptions Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1463 /CH0417 Veterinary Practitioners - Animal Cruelty and Animal Fighting - Reporting Delegate Frush 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0080 (HB0625) Criminal Law - Animal Abuse - Penalties and Restitution Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0084 Maryland Animal Abuse Registry Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0240 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report Senator Robinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0428 (HB0316) State Board of Pharmacy - Dispensing of Drugs Containing Controlled Dangerous Substances - Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0444 Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0631 (HB0941/CH0410) Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment Senator Madaleno 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0680 /CH0605 Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion Time Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0790 /CH0187 (HB0455/CH0188) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Applicability Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0900 (HB0803) Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1030 State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing and License Renewal - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Course Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM