Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abuse -see also- Child Abuse & Neg.; Elder Abuse & Neg., etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057 (SB0556)
Title
State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131 (SB0926)
Title
Criminal Law and Procedure - Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 /CH0061 (SB0152/CH0062)
Title
Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0397 /CH0301 (SB0339/CH0302)
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0561
Title
Criminal Law - Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult - Psychological Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 /CH0072 (SB0355)
Title
Criminal Law – Sexual Contact With an Animal – Aggravated Cruelty to Animals
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 (SB0675)
Title
Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0967
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Residential Service Agencies - Regulation Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152 /CH0062 (HB0135/CH0061)
Title
Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339 /CH0302 (HB0397/CH0301)
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 (HB0641/CH0072)
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Contact With an Animal
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 (HB0057)
Title
State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB0864)
Title
Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB0131)
Title
Criminal Law and Procedure - Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1027
Title
Criminal Law - Abuse and Neglect of Vulnerable Adults - Notice of Report
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 (SB0556) State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB0131 (SB0926) Criminal Law and Procedure - Animal Abuse Registry Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0135 /CH0061 (SB0152/CH0062) Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs Delegate Moon 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0239 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Animal Abuse Registry Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0397 /CH0301 (SB0339/CH0302) Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law) Delegate Krebs 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0561 Criminal Law - Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult - Psychological Abuse Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0641 /CH0072 (SB0355) Criminal Law – Sexual Contact With an Animal – Aggravated Cruelty to Animals Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0850 Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0864 (SB0675) Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0967 Maryland Department of Health - Residential Service Agencies - Regulation Requirements Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0152 /CH0062 (HB0135/CH0061) Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Payment of Costs Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0339 /CH0302 (HB0397/CH0301) Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law) Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Finance
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 (HB0641/CH0072) Criminal Law - Sexual Contact With an Animal Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0556 (HB0057) State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0675 (HB0864) Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0926 (HB0131) Criminal Law and Procedure - Animal Abuse Registry Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1027 Criminal Law - Abuse and Neglect of Vulnerable Adults - Notice of Report Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM