Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Accidents

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Kara's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627 (SB0850)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 (SB0803)
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954 (SB0763)
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987
Title
Punitive Damages - High-Risk Drunk Drivers
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Mandatory Coverage - Medical and Hospital Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Donoghue
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1382
Title
Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1442
Title
Vehicular Accidents - Disclosure of Driver's Home Telephone Number Without Approval - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 (HB0954)
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - Required
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803 (HB0764)
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - Limitation
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 (HB0627)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875
Title
Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891
Title
Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's Estate
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0150 Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Kara's Law) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 PM
HB0627 (SB0850) Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0764 (SB0803) Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - Limitation Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0954 (SB0763) Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - Required Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0987 Punitive Damages - High-Risk Drunk Drivers Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Mandatory Coverage - Medical and Hospital Benefits Delegate Donoghue 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1382 Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law) Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1442 Vehicular Accidents - Disclosure of Driver's Home Telephone Number Without Approval - Prohibition Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0763 (HB0954) Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - Required Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0803 (HB0764) Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - Limitation Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0850 (HB0627) Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0875 Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's Estate Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM