Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Accidents

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426
Title
Education - Concussion Impact Sensor Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682 (SB0545)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160 (SB0919)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Alcohol and Drug Testing - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1212 /CH0248 (SB0348/CH0260)
Title
Use of Text Messaging Device or Handheld Telephone While Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death or Serious Injury - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454
Title
Winter Driving Safety Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130 /CH0038
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry and Workers' Compensation Commission - Reports of Accidental Injury or Disability - Electronic Sharing
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0241
Title
Rules of the Road - Duty to Remain at Scene of Accident - Driver Education and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0260 (HB1212/CH0248)
Title
Use of Text Messaging Device or Handheld Telephone While Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death or Serious Injury - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 /CH0169
Title
Insurance - Definition of Premium - Inclusion of Motor Vehicle Driving Record Report and Accident History Report Fees
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0545 (HB0682)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1160)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0426 Education - Concussion Impact Sensor Pilot Program Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0682 (SB0545) Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1160 (SB0919) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1188 Law Enforcement Officers - Alcohol and Drug Testing - Required Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1212 /CH0248 (SB0348/CH0260) Use of Text Messaging Device or Handheld Telephone While Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death or Serious Injury - Penalties Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1454 Winter Driving Safety Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0130 /CH0038 Commissioner of Labor and Industry and Workers' Compensation Commission - Reports of Accidental Injury or Disability - Electronic Sharing Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Finance
1/09/2014 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0241 Rules of the Road - Duty to Remain at Scene of Accident - Driver Education and Penalties Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0348 /CH0260 (HB1212/CH0248) Use of Text Messaging Device or Handheld Telephone While Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death or Serious Injury - Penalties Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0456 /CH0169 Insurance - Definition of Premium - Inclusion of Motor Vehicle Driving Record Report and Accident History Report Fees Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0545 (HB0682) Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0919 (HB1160) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM