Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Accidents

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 (SB0331/CH0339)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 (SB0778)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430 /CH0247
Title
Drunk Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death - Sanctions for Administrative Per Se Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Tests
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0819
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Alcohol and Drug Testing - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972
Title
Insurance - Transportation Network Insurance - Requirements and Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Daylight Driving Discount for Seniors
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1073
Title
Environment - Crude Oil Rail Transport - Risk Assessment and Accident Prevention Study
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093 (SB0614)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 /CH0470
Title
Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175
Title
Education - Concussion Impact Sensor Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219
Title
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 (SB0868/CH0204)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084
Title
Rules of the Road - Duty to Remain at Scene of Accident - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0323
Title
Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146 /CH0476
Title
Prelitigation Discovery - Insurance Coverage - Prerequisites for Disclosure
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0232
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 /CH0339 (HB0012)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605
Title
Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 (HB1093)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 (HB0172)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0790
Title
Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 /CH0204 (HB1231)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 (SB0331/CH0339) Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0172 (SB0778) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0395 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0430 /CH0247 Drunk Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death - Sanctions for Administrative Per Se Offenses Delegate Folden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0532 Drunk and Drugged Driving - Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Tests Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HB0819 Law Enforcement Officers - Alcohol and Drug Testing - Required Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0972 Insurance - Transportation Network Insurance - Requirements and Coverage Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0974 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Daylight Driving Discount for Seniors Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1073 Environment - Crude Oil Rail Transport - Risk Assessment and Accident Prevention Study Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1093 (SB0614) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1172 /CH0470 Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 AM
HB1175 Education - Concussion Impact Sensor Pilot Program Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1219 Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1231 (SB0868/CH0204) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 9:45 a.m.
Economic Matters
4/13/2015 - 9:45 AM
SB0084 Rules of the Road - Duty to Remain at Scene of Accident - Penalties Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0086 /CH0323 Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0146 /CH0476 Prelitigation Discovery - Insurance Coverage - Prerequisites for Disclosure Senator Zirkin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 476
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0232 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0331 /CH0339 (HB0012) Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Finance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0605 Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0614 (HB1093) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0778 (HB0172) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0790 Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - Penalties Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0868 /CH0204 (HB1231) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM