Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Accidents

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0126)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0157 /CH0518
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0576 (SB0716/CH0575)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667 (SB0553)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 (SB0774/CH0231)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Alcohol and Drug Testing - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284 (SB0627)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle Surfaces
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1364 (SB1039)
Title
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1414
Title
Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation (Ryan's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1506
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 (HB0008)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 /CH0517
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0199
Title
Transit and Transportation Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0553 (HB0667)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627 (HB1284)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle Surfaces
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716 /CH0575 (HB0246/CH0576)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 /CH0231 (HB0805)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1364)
Title
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1073
Title
Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0126) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB0157 /CH0518 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0182 Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0246 /CH0576 (SB0716/CH0575) Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0667 (SB0553) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 (SB0774/CH0231) Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements Delegate Beidle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0857 Law Enforcement Officers - Alcohol and Drug Testing - Required Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1284 (SB0627) Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle Surfaces Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1364 (SB1039) Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance Abuse Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1414 Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation (Ryan's Law) Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1506 Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0126 (HB0008) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0160 /CH0517 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0199 Transit and Transportation Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0553 (HB0667) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0627 (HB1284) Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle Surfaces Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0716 /CH0575 (HB0246/CH0576) Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0774 /CH0231 (HB0805) Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1039 (HB1364) Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance Abuse Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1073 Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - Penalties Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM